Reyes v. City of Fairfield et al

Plaintiff: Christian Reyes
Defendant: City of Fairfield and Robert Murray
Case Number: 2:2018cv00883
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/04/19 MODIFIES the Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery due by 9/20/2019; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/2/2019 with any supplemental or rebuttal experts due 08/16/19; D ispositive Motions filed by 10/22/2019 and heard 11/19/19; Joint Pretrial Statement due 01/10/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez and Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/1/19. (Coll, A)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/13/2018 ORDERING Jury Trial Reset for 1/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. City of Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Reyes
Represented By: Brian T. Dunn
Represented By: Megan Ruth Gyongyos
Represented By: Tim Allen Pori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?