Hopkins v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: William Merril Hopkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv00905
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/23/18 EXTENDING the time 14 Days to 11/9/18, for Plaintiff to file his Opening Brief, in accordance with the Court's Scheduling Order. (Becknal, R)
October 3, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/2/2018 EXTENDING time for Plaintiff to file his opening brief to 10/26/2018. (Zignago, K.)
April 18, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/17/2018 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Fabillaran, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Merril Hopkins
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?