Gosal v. Wells Fargo Bank Home Mortgage Inc.

Plaintiff: Kamaljit K. Gosal
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00908
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/14/2018 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss be granted and that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
June 4, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/2018 DENYING 13 Motion for TRO. (Hunt, G)
May 25, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/24/18, ORDERING that the 5 Motion to Dismiss hearing is CONTINUED to 6/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall file an opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the motion, no later than 5/30/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
April 23, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/23/18 DENYING 9 Motion for TRO and 10 Motion to Expedite. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gosal v. Wells Fargo Bank Home Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamaljit K. Gosal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Le T. Duong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?