Leines v. Homeland Vinyl Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard A. Leines
Defendant: Homeland Vinyl Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00969
Filed: April 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/13/2020 GRANTING 51 Homeland's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff may (1) propound two supplemental interrogatories to Homeland, (2) make two supplemental document reques ts, (3) take one additional Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Homelands person most knowledgeable relating to warranties and lost profits for up to five hours in length by videoconference, and (4) supplement plaintiff's expert report on damages base d on the information received in the additional discovery. Should the parties believe it is necessary, they may file a joint statement within 14 days addressing the necessity of any other amendments to the scheduling order consistent with this order. (Kastilahn, A)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/2020 GRANTING 64 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 65 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Defendant's 69 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART. Defendant's 75 motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Chris Rauwendaal is DENIED as moot. Defendant's 77 motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Stephe n Daughters is DENIED as moot. Defendant's 79 motion to exclude the expert testimony of Mark Knudson is DENIED as moot. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 9/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/2020 GRANTING 61 Motion for leave to file overlength briefs. The Court ORDERS that the parties may file initial moving papers seeking summary judgment totaling up to 30 pages; oppositions to summary judgment totaling up to 30 pages; and replies in support of summary judgment totaling up to 15 pages. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2020 ORDERING that the court construes the terms in Claim II of the '961 Patent as detailed in the order. The court does not rule at this time on the issue of indefiniteness, wh ich it will decide if and when the issue is properly raised in a motion for summary judgment. If Homeland requires an extension of this deadline in light of this order, it may seek one through a stipulation offered by the parties or in an ex parte request. This order resolves ECF No. 35 .(Kastilahn, A)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/18/2019 EXTENDING the time to take third-party deposition. (Becknal, R)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/2019 EXTENDING Discovery cut-off to 11/22/2019; Designation of Expert Witnesses to 12/6/2019; Dispositive Motion Hearing to 2/28/2020. (Zignago, K.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/27/2018 STIPULATING that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be filed with the court within 7 days of this order, and that defendant's responsive pleading is due within 21 days of the filing of the amended complaint. (Huang, H)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/3/2018. (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leines v. Homeland Vinyl Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Leines
Represented By: Eric Benisek
Represented By: Christopher L. Larson
Represented By: Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Vinyl Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?