Fuery v. Cherry et al

Plaintiff: John J. Fuery
Defendant: Mark Cherry, A. Stanley Kubochi, Andrew I. Saucedo, Phillip Stanger, Trevor Doe, Hubert Chen, Jeff Harry, Stephanie Maroun, Alexander Asterlin, Ott, Michael Savage, Jason Stratton, Lauren White, Horst Zetterling and John Winn
Case Number: 2:2018cv00982
Filed: April 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/19 DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to prosecute. (Coll, A)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/1/19 DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days as to why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to prosecute. (Coll, A)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/04/18 GRANTING 13 15 Motions to Dismiss; Fuery has LEAVE to AMEND only as follows: to name the Sacramento County Superior Court or defendants in their official capacities and to request onl y prospective injunctive relief for Fuery's ADA and Rehabilitation Act claims; allegations against Hubert Chen; allegations against Jeff Harry. The court otherwise DENIES Fuery leave to amend as to any other dismissed claims or defendants. (Benson, A.)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/2018 DISMISSING defendants Judge John Winn, Judge Laurel White, Judge Michael Savage, Court Commissioner Phillip Stanger and Court Clerk Trevor Shaddox, because these defendants are protected by judicial and quasi-judicial immunity. The 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice and without leave to amend because amendment would be futile. (York, M)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/16/18 GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time; defendants have until 06/15/18 to respond to Complaint. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuery v. Cherry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Fuery
Represented By: John Joseph Fuery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cherry
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Stanley Kubochi
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew I. Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Stanger
Represented By: Carolee G. Kilduff
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Doe
Represented By: Carolee G. Kilduff
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Chen
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Harry
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Maroun
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Asterlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Savage
Represented By: Carolee G. Kilduff
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stratton
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren White
Represented By: Carolee G. Kilduff
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horst Zetterling
Represented By: Jill B. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Winn
Represented By: Carolee G. Kilduff
Represented By: Derick E. Konz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?