Stevens v. Siemens Mobility
Plaintiff: Ray Stevens
Defendant: Siemens Mobility and Superior Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv01065
Filed: April 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/18 Recommending that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 6 be dismissed without leave to amend for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to these F&Rs due within twenty one days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/6/2018 GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 7/3/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/2018 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and DISMISSING 1 Complaint because it does not sufficiently state a cognizable claim. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that names defendants who are amenable to suit, and which complies with the instructions given above. (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Siemens Mobility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Mobility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?