Service Joy Corporation et al v. YGM Franchise LLC et al

Plaintiff: Service Joy Corporation, Rakesh Reddy and Ashika Reddy
Defendant: YGM Franchise LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01237
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/4/19 CONTINUING the stay in this action to and including 4/30/19. If the case does not resolve, the parties are directed to file a further Joint Status Report not later than 5/1/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/16/19 CONTINUING the STAY in this matter to 02/28/19; if the case does not resolve, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 03/01/19. (Benson, A.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/13/2018 STAYING this matter until 12/14/2018. If the case does not resolve, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report not later than 1/11/2019. Defendant's 4 Motion to Transfer and Stay Action is DENIED without prejudice to renewing the Motion should the current settlement efforts prove ineffective. (Zignago, K.)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/16/2018 ORDERING this matter is hereby stayed to and including 10/15/2018. If the case does not resolve, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report not later than 11/9/2018. (Washington, S)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/19/18 STAYING case until 08/06/18. If the case does not resolve, the parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 09/07/18. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Joy Corporation et al v. YGM Franchise LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Joy Corporation
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakesh Reddy
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashika Reddy
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YGM Franchise LLC
Represented By: John T. Kinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?