Trump v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clifford Trump
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv01610
Filed: June 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/4/19 ORDERING Defendant to pay Plaintiff's attorney fees pursuant to the EAJA in accordance with this stipulation. Plaintiff's previously filed motion for fees 29 is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/27/19 REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security. (Kaminski, H)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/20/2019 EXTENDING Time to 7/21/2019, for Defendant to File a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (York, M)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/20/19 GRANTING defendant until 6/21/2019 to file her cross-motion for summary judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/23/2019 EXTENDING time for plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment brief to 4/25/2019. (Huang, H)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/1/19 EXTENDING time to file Motion for Summary Judgment to 4/22/2019. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/26/2019 DISCHARGING 14 Order to Show Cause. (Huang, H)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/18/19 DISCHARGING the order to show cause issued on 9/18/19 8 . Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismi ssed for failure to inform the court regarding consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, as required by the Court's scheduling order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on Plaintiff a copy of the court's form entitled "Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment." (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/17/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the United States Marshall. (York, M)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/6/2018 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days. (Copy to USM) (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trump v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Trump
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?