Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 162.225.207.215
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 162.225.207.215
Case Number: 2:2018cv01667
Filed: June 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/18 ORDERING that the Court's Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 9 ) is DISCHARGED. (Becknal, R)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/9/2018 ORDERING that within 14 days of this order, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why the court should not impose sanctions based upon its failure to follow the courts previous order. (Zignago, K.)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/3/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 6 x Parte Application for Leave to Service Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. The ISP shall be served with a subpoena seeking only the t rue name and address of the person or entity to whom the ISP is assigned. Once plaintiff has obtained the actual identity of the person or entity associated with the IP address captioned herein, it may serve on that person or entity a copy of this Or der; informal service of process shall be permitted absent further order of this court. The parties, both plaintiff and the potential defendant, are hereby invited to attend an informal chambers conference before the undersigned for the followingpur poses: a. A discussion of the potential to enter into a settlement; b. In the absence of an agreed settlement, to establish a procedure to further protect the identity of the defendant, if warranted; c. To set a schedule that will allow the defendant an opportunity to file a motion to quash the subpoena if there are true and adequate grounds therefor; d. Procedures for service of process or waiver thereof. The parties are advised that attendance at such a conference is voluntary and will not i tself constitute a waiver of service of the Complaint, or result in a finding of "appearance" in the litigation, unless the case is resolved at the conference and a settlement is placed on the record of the court, or the potential defend ant agrees to waive service. Plaintiff shall notify the court, by a status statement filed no later than 45 days, that the foregoing service of this order has been effected, and whether defendant has acceded to attendance at the informal chamber s conference, without identifying the defendant other than by listing the defendant as a John or Jane Doe at the specific IP address captioned above. Plaintiff is cautioned that, until permission is given by the court, it is not to reveal the ident ity of the defendant in or out of court. Nothing in this Order would preclude plaintiff and defendant from reaching a settlement without court participation before any informal conference is held or formal service of process is effected. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 162.225.207.215
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 162.225.207.215
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?