Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service

Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv01694
Filed: June 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/19 DENYING 19 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2018 GRANTING 30 Permission to dispense with the requirement of filing a Statement of Undisputed Facts when filing its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Reader, L)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/10/2018 ORDERING the deadline for defendant's summary judgment opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 12/21/2018. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/20/2018 APPROVING 26 Stipulation and MODIFYING SCHEDULE. The deadlines set forth in the 14 Order are extended as follows: Plaintiff's reply/opposition due by 1/31/2019 and Defendant's reply due by 2/21/2019. (York, M)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/25/18 ORDERING that Defendant lodge/serve Administrative Record due Oct. 5, 2018. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due Nov. 13, 2018. Defendant's opposition/cross-motion for summary judgment due Dec. 17, 2018. Plaintiff's reply/ opposition due Jan. 10, 2019. Defendant's reply due Jan. 31, 2019. Cross-Motions Hearing to be determined. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Congress v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Represented By: Sean T. Malone, PHV
Represented By: Andrew Mulkey, PHV
Represented By: Andrew Gibson Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?