Yegorov v. Japan
Plaintiff: Dmitriy Yegorov
Defendant: Japan
Case Number: 2:2018cv01731
Filed: June 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/13/2018 ORDERING that the 4 findings and recommendations are VACATED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/11/18 RECOMMENDING that this his action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/2018 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and DIRECTING Plaintiff, no later than 7/6/2018, to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yegorov v. Japan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitriy Yegorov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?