Martin v. California Teachers Association et al

Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Defendant: California Teachers Association, National Education Associaton, Riverside Unified School District, Eric Banks, Mark Gregersen, Edmond G. Brown, Xavier Becerra, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow and Riverside City Teachers Association
Case Number: 2:2018cv01951
Filed: July 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE by California Teachers Association, National Education Associaton, Riverside City Teachers Association to #14 Notice of Related Case - ATY. (Kronland, Scott)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02230- MCE-CKD by Michael Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Allen v. SCCCPOA, No. 2:18-cv-02230-MCE-CKD)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02419-WBS-EFB by Michael Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Hernandez v. AFSCME California, No. 2:18-cv-02419-WBS-EFB)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 JOINDER by Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Edmond G. Brown, Mark Gregersen, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow in #11 Motion to Change Venue Attorney Richards, Nelson Ryan added. (Richards, Nelson) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 09/07/2018: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the October 4, 2018 hearing on the Motion to Change Venue #11 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Anderson, J)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by California Teachers Association, National Education Associaton, Riverside City Teachers Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Declaration of Tim Martin, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Benson, A.).
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Not More than 28 Days by California Teachers Association, National Education Associaton, Riverside City Teachers Association. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 8/21/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra, Edmond G. Brown, and Members of the California Public Employment Relations Board: Waivers sent on 7/20/2018. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 8/20/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
August 11, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: National Education Associaton Waiver sent on 7/20/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: California Teachers Association and Riverside City Teachers Association Waiver sent on 7/20/2018. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 8/14/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephen Duvernay on behalf of Michael Martin. Attorney Duvernay, Stephen added. (Duvernay, Stephen)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/17/2018 ORDERING attorney Jonathan Mitchell, PHV, ADDED for Michael Martin. (Fabillaran, J)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michael Martin for attorney Jonathan Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7764146) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Benbrook, Bradley)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Edmond G. Brown, California Teachers Association, Mark Gregersen, Arthur A. Krantz, National Education Associaton, Riverside City Teachers Association, Riverside Unified School District, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group, PC* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, California 95814*. (Reader, L)
July 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Martin. Attorney Benbrook, Bradley A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7762482) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benbrook, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. California Teachers Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Teachers Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Education Associaton
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gregersen
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond G. Brown
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Winslow
Represented By: Nelson Ryan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside City Teachers Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?