(PS) Whitsitt v. City of Tracy, California et al

Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Defendant: Sgt. Ventura, Gardener and City of Tracy, California
Case Number: 2:2018cv01962
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 OBJECTION by Plaintiff William J. Whitsitt re #3 Order denying application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Kastilahn, A)
July 19, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on William J. Whitsitt. (Fabillaran, J)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/2018 DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $400.00 on the installment schedule set forth in this order. Once the first installment payment is made, the court will direct service of the complaint on the named defendants. (Fabillaran, J)
July 18, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William J. Whitsitt. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Tracy, California, Gardener, Ventura by William J. Whitsitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Whitsitt v. City of Tracy, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tracy, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Whitsitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?