Eckland v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Arnold A. Eckland
Defendant: Dunn, Haghbin, Richard and Captain
Case Number: 2:2018cv01979
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-03969.
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/9/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arnold A. Eckland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dunn, Haghbin, Richard, and Captain. Filed by Arnold A. Eckland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified on 7/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckland v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haghbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold A. Eckland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?