Western States Trucking Association v. Schoorl et al
Plaintiff: Western States Trucking Association
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Andre Schoorl
Intervenor: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Case Number: 2:2018cv01989
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for LEAVE to File Points and Authorities, or, in the alternative, Amicus Brief, in support of #6 Motion to Dismiss by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File)(Leyton, Stacey) Modified on 9/14/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY by International Brotherhood of Teamsters in support of #8 Motion to Intervene. (Leyton, Stacey) Modified on 9/14/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for ONE DAY EXTENSION of TIME by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl to #8 Motion to Intervene. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Western States Trucking Association to #8 Motion to Intervene. (Whalen, Patrick)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 JOINDER in #6 Motion to Dismiss by Andre Schoorl in. Attorney Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose Alfonso added. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) Modified on 9/10/2018 (Benson, A.).
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stacey M. Leyton on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Attorney Leyton, Stacey M. added. (Leyton, Stacey)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 08/27/2018: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the September 20, 2018 and October 4, 2018 hearings on the MOTION to INTERVENE #8 and MOTION to DISMISS #6 ] are vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Anderson, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to INTERVENE by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Bradley Raymond , #2 Proposed Order)(Kushner, Andrew) Modified on 8/28/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Kushner on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Attorney Kushner, Andrew Edward added. (Kushner, Andrew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to initial complaint by not more than 30 days (L.R. 8-3) by Xavier Becerra. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) Modified on 8/14/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Xavier Becerra. Attorney Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose Alfonso added. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick James Whalen* *Ellison Whalen and Blackburn* *1201 K Street Suite 1960* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Washington, S)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for injunctive relief against All Defendants by Western States Trucking Association. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7770242) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whalen, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western States Trucking Association v. Schoorl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Schoorl
Represented By: Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western States Trucking Association
Represented By: Patrick James Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?