(PC) Henderson v. Lizzaraga et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr
Defendant: Perez, K. Ancheta, Ramirez, C. Smith, Sam Wong, C. Clevenger, Joe Lizzaraga, Brett Stacy, T. Moua, James Jackson and A. Thorpe
Case Number: 2:2018cv02181
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Craig M Kellison
2 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST for Copies by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Huang, H)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to PO Box 409060, Ione CA 95640 by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Coll, A)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Reader, L)
September 4, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Reassigning Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge, served on Curtis Lee Henderson Sr. (Reader, L)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison* to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. (Reader, L)
August 22, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice, served on Curtis Lee Henderson Sr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This CASE has been ASSIGNED to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez and U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison pursuant to #8 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. The New Case Number is 2:18-cv-02181- JAM CMK (PC). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
August 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,, served on Curtis Lee Henderson Sr. (Plummer, M)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/16/18 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Curtis Lee Henderson Sr. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr (Reader, L)
August 13, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Notice re TRUST STATEMENT NEEDED,, served on Curtis Lee Henderson Sr. (Plummer, M)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr, CDC H-43488 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 10, 2018 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Benson, A.)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *8/9/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 9/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Benson, A.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Benson, A.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Henderson v. Lizzaraga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ancheta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Clevenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lizzaraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Moua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?