AFC Realty Capital, Inc. v. Dale et al
Plaintiff: AFC Realty Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Rohit Ranchhod, Sundeep S. Dale, California Fruit Building, LLC, American Hospitality Services, Inc., Dale Investments, LLC and Sundeep Dale, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02389
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the December 13, 2018 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #10 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by defendants. Attorney Hoffman, Jason Loren added. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Notice Motion Dismiss, #2 Request Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Jason)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Fruit Building, LLC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Baxter, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Dale Investments, LLC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Baxter, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sundeep Dale, LLC served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Baxter, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sundeep S. Dale served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Baxter, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: American Hospitality Services, Inc. Waiver sent on 9/13/2018. by AFC Realty Capital, Inc. (Baxter, Daniel) Modified on 9/19/2018 (Washington, S).
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Rohit Ranchhod Waiver sent on 9/13/2018 by AFC Realty Capital, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel) Modified on 9/19/2018 (Washington, S).
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Hospitality Services, Inc., California Fruit Building, LLC, Sundeep S. Dale, Dale Investments, LLC, Rohit Ranchhod, Sundeep Dale, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Lawrence Baxter* *Wilke Fleury Hoffelt Gould and Birney LLP* *400 Capitol Mall, 22nd Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (York, M)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by AFC Realty Capital, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7839409) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baxter, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFC Realty Capital, Inc. v. Dale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFC Realty Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohit Ranchhod
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundeep S. Dale
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Fruit Building, LLC
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundeep Dale, LLC
Represented By: Jason Loren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?