(PC) Bonilla v. Aronson et al
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Defendant: Killi Smith and Brian R. Aronson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02406
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Plummer, M)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/22/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re Filing Fees by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
September 28, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-02406-KJM-EFB (PC). (Huang, H)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
September 13, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Plummer, M)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/12/18 ORDERING plaintiff has 30 days from the date of service of this order to submit either the filing fee or the application required by section 1915(a). The clerk of the court is directed to mail to plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
September 5, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Becknal, R)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Steven Wayne Bonilla.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bonilla v. Aronson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Killi Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R. Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?