Sream, Inc. et al v. Raj et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.
Defendant: Gurmail Raj
Case Number: 2:2018cv02534
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/6/2018: Plaintiff's #10 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 12/12/18 Motion For Default Judgment hearing is granted. Counsel is instructed to use the following to connect to the call: 877-848-7030 (phone), 7431521 (access code).(Streeter, J)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 12/12/2018 hearing re #9 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc. by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran) Modified on 11/7/2018 (Kaminski, H).
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of I. Vakil, #3 Declaration of M. Mottsheard and Exhibit D, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Vakil, Imran) Modified on 11/7/2018 (Kaminski, H).
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Gurmail Raj* (Kastilahn, A)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gurmail Raj by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. (Vakil, Imran)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gurmail Raj served on 09/27/18. (Vakil, Imran) Modified on 10/9/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 2,235,638 * * 03/30/1999 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #2:* 2,307,176 * * 01/11/2000 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #3:* 3,675,839 * * 09/01/2009 * * Martin Birzle * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Trademark Report, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gurmail Raj* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Imran F. Vakil* *NEXIO, PC* *245 Fischer Avenue, Suite C-3* *Costa Mesa, California 92626*. (Reader, L)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gurmail Raj by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. Attorney Vakil, Imran F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7876208) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Raj et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurmail Raj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?