Aliser et al v. SEIU California et al

Plaintiff: James White, Javier Palmerin, Teresa Boyle, Erin Thompson, Renee Browne, Peter Finn, Stephanie Caudel, Tom McCavitt, Maureen O'Brien, Ruth Aliser, Samira Golbad, Miriam E. Noujaim, Barbara Park, Kenton Miller and Lorenzo Nolan
Defendant: SEIU California, Alex M. Azar, II, Rob Feckner, California State Retirees, Henry Jones, Priya Mathur, Theresa Taylor, SEIU Local 521, United States of America, Xavier Becerra, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Edmund G. Brown, Seema Verma, Erich Shiners, SEIU Local 721, Betty Yee, Betty T. Yee, John Chiang, SEIU Local 1021, California State Employees Association, Margaret Brown, SEIU Local 2015, Priscilla Winslow, California State University Employees Union, Dana Hollinger, Bill Slaton, Eric Banks, Arthur A. Krantz, David Miller, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Ramon Rubalcava, Richard Costigan and SEIU Local 1000
Case Number: 2:2018cv02574
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Knapp, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/14/18 GRANTING #25 unopposed Motion to exceed the page limitation applicable to its opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary injunction Motion. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 STATEMENT of No Position Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by Defendants Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Edmund G. Brown, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee, Betty Yee re #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (O'Brien, Anthony)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/18 GRANTING Defendants California State University Employees Union, SEIU Local 721, and SEIU Local 2015 until 11/20/18 to respond to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery and GRANTING Plaintiffs until 11/27/18 to file a reply in support of the motion. (Coll, A)
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to exceed page limitation re #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/15/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery by California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. Attorney Lee, Rebecca Moryl added. (Lee, Rebecca) Modified on 11/13/2018 (Kaminski, H).
November 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson re #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the November 29, 2018 hearing on the #21 Motion for Discovery is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Fabillaran, J)
November 1, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Ruth Aliser, Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Peter Finn, Samira Golbad, Tom McCavitt, Kenton Miller, Lorenzo Nolan, Miriam E. Noujaim, Maureen O'Brien, Javier Palmerin, Barbara Park, Erin Thompson, James White. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 11/2/2018 (Washington, S).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/25/18 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until November 20, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 10/25/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Fraser Knapp on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma. Attorney Knapp, Michael Fraser added. (Knapp, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kronland on behalf of California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/15/2018 GRANTING #15 the parties joint ex parte application for extension of time; Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs complaint by 12/7/2018. (Reader, L)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION by Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Edmund G. Brown, Betty Yee for Joint Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony O'Brien, #2 Declaration of Scott Kronlund, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 10/15/2018 (Zignago, K.).
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the November 15, 2018 hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson in SUPPORT of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alex M. Azar and Seema Verma served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Board of Trustees of the California State University, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, and SEIU Local 721 served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California State Employees Association, California State Retirees, California State University Employees Union and SEIU Local 1000 served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Margaret Brown, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, SEIU California, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee and Betty Yee served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/27/18 ADDING Attorney Jonathan F. Michell, PHV for all plaintiffs. (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alex M. Azar, II, Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Edmund G. Brown, Margaret Brown, California State Employees Association, California State Retirees, California State University Employees Union, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, United States of America, Seema Verma, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee, Betty Yee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group, PC* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, California 95814*. (Reader, L)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Duvernay on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Benbrook, Bradley)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley A. Benbrook on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Benbrook, Bradley)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by all plaintiffs for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7873594) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas))(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all plaintiffs. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7873591) (Attachments: #1 Cal. Gov't Code 1152.12, #2 42 U.S.C. 1396a(a)(32), #3 42 C.F.R. 447.10, #4 Proposed Rule, #5 42 U.S.C. 1396c, #6 Renee Browne e-mails, #7 Kenton Miller e-mails, #8 Peter Finn letters and e-mails, #9 Stephanie Caudel letters, #10 Samira Golbad letters, #11 Teresa Boyle letters, #12 Erin Thompson documents, #13 Mariam Noujaim documents, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aliser et al v. SEIU California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU California
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Feckner
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Retirees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Jones
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priya Mathur
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 521
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria Jenkins-Jones
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 721
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Yee
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 1021
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Employees Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 2015
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Winslow
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State University Employees Union
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Hollinger
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Slaton
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Rubalcava
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Costigan
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 1000
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Palmerin
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Boyle
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Thompson
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Browne
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Finn
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Caudel
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom McCavitt
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen O'Brien
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Aliser
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samira Golbad
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam E. Noujaim
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Park
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenton Miller
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Nolan
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?