American Cable Association et al v. Becerra

Plaintiff: NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, American Cable Association and USTelecom The Broadband Association
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv02684
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 part 2) (Becknal, R)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/18 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to remove from the public docket the originally filed Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [3-1] and Declaration of Joe Ruszkiewicz [3-3] and to replace them on the public docket with the Redacted Versions; the Associations are ORDERED to re-file the originally filed Memorandum and Declaration under SEAL. (Becknal, R)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2018 ORDERING the case STAYED until the later of the following: (a) the D.C. Circuit issues its opinion in the petitions for review currently pending in Mozilla Corp. v. FCC, and the period for seeking further review from the D.C. Circuit and the U.S. Supreme Court has expired; or (b) a final decision has been issued by the D.C. Circuit or the U.S. Supreme Court in response to any petition for rehearing or certiorari, either denying such petition or issuing a final decision. Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction have been withdrawn without prejudice to their refiling at a future date. The hearing on the motions, previously set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. is taken off calendar. (Washington, S)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2018 ORDERING Defendants' deadline to file their brief in opposition to the motions for a preliminary injunction is EXTENDED to 10/30/2018. (Washington, S)
October 26, 2018 Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Temporary Stay of Litigation and Agreement Not to Enforce Senate Bill 822 by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 26, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motions by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association. Attorney Angstreich, Scott H. added. (Angstreich, Scott)
October 19, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICUS BRIEF by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Weir, Bryan)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/2018 IT IS SO ORDERED Attorney Brendan J. Crimmins, to arrear for CTIA - The Wireless Association and USTelecom The Broadband Association. (Reader, L)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/2018 IT IS SO ORDERED Attorney Scott H. Angstreich, to appear for CTIA - The Wireless Association, and USTelecom The Broadband Association. (Reader, L)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/2018 ADDING attorney Rachel Proctor May, PHV for CTIA - The Wireless Association and USTelecom The Broadband Association. (Washington, S)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association for attorney Brendan J. Crimmins to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7918865) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Marc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association for attorney Scott H. Angstreich to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7918851) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Marc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association for attorney Rachel Proctor May to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7918824) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Marc)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/10/2018 ORDERING the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is SET for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Any motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of motion shall be filed on or by 10/19/2018; Defendant's one brief in opposition to both motions shall be filed on or by 10/26/2018; Any motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of defendants shall be filed on or by 11/2/2018; Plaintiffs may each file their own reply in support of their respective motions on or by 11/9/2018. Defendants' time to answer or respond to complaints shall be EXTENDED to 30 days after Court enters an order resolving the respective motions for preliminary injunction filed in those matters. (Washington, S)
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction Motions by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/5/2018 GRANTING #16 Application as to Attorney Adam J. Tuetken, PHV to represent NCTA - The Internet & Television Association. (York, M)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/5/2018 GRANTING #15 Application as to Attorney Matthew T. Murchison, PHV to represent NCTA - The Internet & Television Association. (York, M)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/5/2018 GRANTING #14 Application as to Attorney Matthew A. Brill, PHV to represent NCTA - The Internet & Television Association. (York, M)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association re #13 Civil New Case Documents for JAM, #12 Order Reassigning Case,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,. (Lewis, Marc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz on behalf of Xavier Becerra. Attorney Kurtz, Sarah Elizabeth added. (Kurtz, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peiyin Patty Li on behalf of Xavier Becerra. Attorney Li, Peiyin Patty added. (Li, Peiyin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NCTA - The Internet & Television Association for Attorney Adam J. Tuetken to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225.00, receipt number 0972-7907034) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, Marc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NCTA - The Internet & Television Association for Attorney Matthew T. Murchison to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225.00, receipt number 0972-7907026) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, Marc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NCTA - The Internet & Television Association for Attorney Matthew A. Brill to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225.00, receipt number 0972-7906986) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, Marc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Michel, G.)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/03/18 REASSIGNING THIS CASE to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:18-CV-02684 JAM-DB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Lewis, Marc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transferring Matter to Judge John A. Mendez by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, USTelecom The Broadband Association. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Marc R. Lewis* *Lewis & Llewellyn LLP* *505 Montgomery Street, Suite 1300* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Kaminski, H)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff USTelecom The Broadband Association. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff NCTA - The Internet & Television Association. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff American Cable Association. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, USTelecom. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Ken Klauer, #3 Declaration of Joe Ruszkiewicz, #4 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Marc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/29/2018) (Becknal, R). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/29/2018) (Becknal, R).
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02660 by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, USTelecom. (Lewis, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association , USTelecom The Broadband Association . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7901311) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Marc) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Cable Association et al v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCTA - The Internet & Television Association
Represented By: Marc R. Lewis
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, PHV
Represented By: Adam J. Tuetken, PHV
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, PHV
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: Marc R. Lewis
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, PHV
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, PHV
Represented By: Rachel Proctor May, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Cable Association
Represented By: Marc R. Lewis
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USTelecom The Broadband Association
Represented By: Marc R. Lewis
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, PHV
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, PHV
Represented By: Rachel Proctor May, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?