(PC) Bledsoe v. Leatuge et al
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Defendant: Leatuge, San Joaquin County Jail, Christen and Michell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02710
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Donnell Bledsoe.(York, M)
November 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Huang, H)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/5/2018 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the court the completed Notice of Amendment and an original and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint. (Huang, H)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
October 16, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Non-Prisoner IFP form served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/18 DISMISSING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff, who is now out of custody, a new application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.. (Plummer, M)
October 5, 2018 SERVICE over the counter: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donnell Bledsoe. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Donnell Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bledsoe v. Leatuge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leatuge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?