(PS)LeBus et al v. The County of Trinity et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Marie LeBus and Thomas J. Fox
Defendant: Leslie Hubbard, Mike McHugh, Terry Mines, Carson Anderson, Trinity County Board of Supervisors, Trinity County Planning Department, Xavier Becerra, Diana Stewart, Edmund G. Brown, The County of Trinity, Bruce Haney, Anton Jaegel, Keith Groves, Margaret Long, Trinity County Zoning Department, Rob Barcellona, Robert Vincent Barcellona, Dan Frasier, Ruth Hanover, Graham Mathews, Judy Pfleuger, Richard Hoard, John Jelicich, John D. Fenley, Judy Yzquierdo, Michael Harper, Robert Barcellona, Deborah Chapman, Ron Hanover, Trinity County California, Eric Heryford and Colleen O'Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2018cv02720
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Dennis M Cota
2 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 21 Minute Order served on Thomas J. Fox and Naomi Marie LeBus. (Cannarozzi, N)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss #9 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/26/2018. (Text only entry)(Cannarozzi, N)
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY by Michael Harper, Eric Heryford re #13 Opposition to Motion. (Rhoan, Erick)
November 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Order served on Thomas J. Fox and Naomi Marie LeBus. (Coll, A)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/14/18 RECUSING himself from this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan added. Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota no longer assigned to case. #10 Motion to disqualify is DENIED as moot. New Case Number: 2:18-cv-2720-JAM-EFB (PS). (Coll, A)
November 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default, served on Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Carson Anderson, Rob Barcellona, Robert Vincent Barcellona, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Deborah Chapman, John D. Fenley, Dan Frasier, Keith Groves, Bruce Haney, Ron Hanover(Officer), Ron Hanover(Deputy Sheriff), Ruth Hanover, Richard Hoard, Leslie Hubbard, Anton Jaegel, John Jelicich, Graham Mathews, Mike McHugh, Terry Mines, Colleen O'Sullivan, Judy Pfleuger, Diana Stewart, Judy Yzquierdo. The clerk hereby declines to enter #14 Request for Entry of Default, filed by Naomi Marie LeBus, Thomas J. Fox due to No service of process provided. (TEXT ONLY) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF of SERVICE by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus re #16 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge, #14 Request for Entry of Default,. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF of SERVICE by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus re #16 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge, #14 Request for Entry of Default,. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to RECUSE Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carson Anderson, Robert Vincent Barcellona, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Deborah Chapman, John D. Fenley, Dan Frasier, Keith Groves, Bruce Haney, Ron Hanover(Officer), Ron Hanover(Deputy Sheriff), Richard Hoard, Anton Jaegel, Graham Mathews, Terry Mines, Judy Pfleuger, Diana Stewart, Judy Yzquierdo by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 8, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Decline of Entry of Default, served on Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Kaminski, H)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Carson Anderson, Rob Barcellona, Robert Barcellona(Deputy Sheriff), Robert Barcellona, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Deborah Chapman, John D. Fenley, Dan Frasier, Keith Groves, Bruce Haney, Ron Hanover(Officer), Ron Hanover(Deputy Sheriff), Ruth Hanover, Richard Hoard, Leslie Hubbard, Anton Jaegel, John Jelicich, Margaret Long. The clerk hereby declines to enter #11 Request for Entry of Default due to no service of process provided. (TEXT ONLY) (Kaminski, H)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carson Anderson, Rob Barcellona, Robert Barcellona(Deputy Sheriff), Robert Barcellona, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Deborah Chapman, John D. Fenley, Dan Frasier, Keith Groves, Bruce Haney, Ron Hanover(Officer), Ron Hanover(Deputy Sheriff), Ruth Hanover, Richard Hoard, Leslie Hubbard, Anton Jaegel, John Jelicich, Margaret Long, Graham Mathews, Mike McHugh, Terry Mines, Colleen O'Sullivan, Judy Pfleuger, Diana Stewart, The County of Trinity, Trinity County Board of Supervisors, Trinity County California, Trinity County Planning Department, Trinity County Zoning Department, Judy Yzquierdo by Thomas J. Fox by plaintiffs. (Kaminski, H)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to recuse judge by Naomi Marie LeBus. (Kaminski, H)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Michael Harper, Eric Heryford. Attorney Rhoan, Erick J. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Rhoan, Erick)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomas J. Fox. (Coll, A)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Naomi Marie LeBus. (Coll, A)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to grant E-Filing by Thomas J. Fox and Naomi Marie LeBus. (Coll, A)
October 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE200093187 $400.00 by Thomas J. Fox on 10/9/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons, served on Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Carson Anderson, Rob Barcellona, Robert Barcellona(Deputy Sheriff), Robert Barcellona, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Deborah Chapman, John D. Fenley, Dan Frasier, Keith Groves, Bruce Haney, Ron Hanover(Officer), Ron Hanover(Deputy Sheriff), Ruth Hanover, Michael Harper, Eric Heryford, Richard Hoard, Leslie Hubbard, Anton Jaegel, John Jelicich, Margaret Long, Graham Mathews, Mike McHugh, Terry Mines, Colleen O'Sullivan, Judy Pfleuger, Diana Stewart, The County of Trinity, Trinity County Board of Supervisors, Trinity County California, Trinity County Planning Department, Trinity County Zoning Department, Judy Yzquierdo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Naomi Marie LeBus* *PO Box 636* *Douglas City, CA 96024*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Action by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas J. Fox, Naomi Marie LeBus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) [MAINTAINED ON PAPER](Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)LeBus et al v. The County of Trinity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Mines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity County Planning Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Trinity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Jaegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity County Zoning Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Barcellona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vincent Barcellona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Pfleuger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hoard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jelicich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Fenley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Yzquierdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harper
Represented By: Erick J. Rhoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barcellona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Hanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity County California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Heryford
Represented By: Erick J. Rhoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Marie LeBus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?