(PS) Umina v. MacKenzie et al

Plaintiff: Leonard Umina
Defendant: Lucas Lumina and Roderick L MacKenzie
Case Number: 2:2018cv02767
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Findings and Recommendations served on Leonard Umina. (Huang, H) Modified on 12/13/2018 (Huang, H).
December 13, 2018 Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/13/2018 RECOMMENDING that #11 Motion to Remand be granted, and that this action be summarily remanded to the Sacramento County Superior Court. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: MOTION HEARING held on 12/12/2018 re #11 MOTION to REMAND. Arguments heard. Matter submitted. Order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Pro Se present. Defendants Counsel Roderick MacKenzie present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Ecro. (Streeter, J)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie re #17 Opposition. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Leonard Umina to #15 Request for Judicial Notice. (Kaminski, H)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY by Leonard Umina to Opposition to #11 Motion to Remand. (Becknal, R)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie in re #14 Opposition to Motion. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie to #11 MOTION to REMAND. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Minute Order served on Leonard Umina. (Streeter, J)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/30/2018: Plaintiff's #12 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 12/12/2018 Motion to Remand hearing is granted. Plaintiff is instructed to use the following to connect to the call: 877-848-7030 (phone), 7431521 (access code).(Streeter, J)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 12/12/2018 motion hearing re #11 Motion to Remand by Leonard Umina. (Huang, H)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND by Leonard Umina. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Huang, H)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L MacKenzie. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
October 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Roderick L MacKenzie, Leonard Umina. (Flores, E)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Montana; Case Number 9:18-cv-00175.
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/11/2018. (TCL) Modified on 10/11/2018; copy mailed to Plaintiff (NOS). [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Donald W. Molloy recused. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/5/2018. (dle) Modified on 10/10/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Plaintiff (APP). [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/5/2018. (dle) Modified on 10/10/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Plaintiff (APP). [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie. (MacKenzie, Roderick) [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX900012863 (KJL) [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie from Superior Court of California in and For the County of Sacramento, case number 34-2018-00235367., filed by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Joinder in Notice of Removal Action, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 Answer) (KJL) [Transferred from mtd on 10/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Umina v. MacKenzie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Lumina
Represented By: Roderick L. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick L MacKenzie
Represented By: Roderick L. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Umina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?