(HC) Brown v. Unknown
Defendant: Unknown
Petitioner: Sequoia John Brown
Case Number: 2:2018cv02822
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Sequoia John Brown. (Coll, A)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/18 DIRECTING the clerk to randomly assign a district judge. District Judge Troy L. Nunley added. It is further RECOMMENDED that this action be Dismissed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. New Case Number: 2:18-cv-2822-EFB (HC). (Coll, A)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP form served on Sequoia John Brown. (Coll, A)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/30/18 DIRECTING plaintiff to submit filing fee or the IFP form within 30 days from the date of this order. (Coll, A)
October 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sequoia John Brown. (Huang, H)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Unknown by Sequoia John Brown.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Brown v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sequoia John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?