Imhoff et al v. California Teachers Association et al

Plaintiff: James Imhoff and Lucille Imhoff
Defendant: California Teachers Association and Colusa Educators Association
Case Number: 2:2018cv02934
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Ramon Gomez in SUPPORT of #7 Motion to Transfer Venue (Resubmitted). (Kronland, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the January 24, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Change Venue #7 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by CA Teachers Association, Colusa Educators Assoc. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ramon Gomez [counsel to re-file], #3 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 12/19/2018 (Reader, L).
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Colusa Educators Association on 11/12/2018, Answer due 1/11/2019 (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/18. ADDED Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV for Plaintiffs James Imhoff and Lucille Imhoff. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 11, 2018 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by James Imhoff, Lucille Imhoff for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7963590) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Teachers Association, Colusa Educators Association * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley A. Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (York, M)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Imhoff, Lucille Imhoff. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7958813) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Benbrook, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imhoff et al v. California Teachers Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Teachers Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colusa Educators Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Imhoff
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Imhoff
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?