Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv02956
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Arias, Cathy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Starbucks Corporation. (Arias, Cathy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Starbucks Corporation. Attorney Arias, Cathy L. added.(Arias, Cathy)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Starbucks Corporation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Masanque, Isabel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Starbucks Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christina Michelle Carson* *Center for Disability Access* *P.O. Box 262490 9845 Erma Rd., Suite 300* *San Diego, CA 92131*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Scott Johnson. Attorney Carson, Christina Michelle added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7963599) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Christina Michelle Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?