Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc.
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02960
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Soskin, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Soskin, Stephen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 3/28/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen P. Soskin* *Charlston, Revich & Wollitz LLP* *1925 Century Park East, #1250* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Soskin, Stephen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney Soskin, Stephen P. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7962960) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soskin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen P. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Revolver Club of Sacramento, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?