Hood et al v. Amgen, Inc. et al
Case Number: 2:2018cv02981
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/22/21 GRANTING 38 plaintiff-relator's Motion to Stay Proceedings. The parties shall file a joint status report within 14 days after arbitration is completed to inform the court whether any issues remain for this court's resolution. All dates are VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/15/2021 GRANTING 42 Stipulation. Defendant Amgen Inc.'s time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Count 6 of Plaintiff's Complaint in this action shall be EXTENDED to 30 days after the date Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Action Pending Arbitration (Docket No. 38) is denied, if ever. (Tupolo, A)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/3/2021 ORDERING that Counts 1 through 5 are DISMISSED without prejudice as to the Relator and as to the United States. (Becknal, R)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/30/2021 CONTINUTING Initial Scheduling Conference to 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, a Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2021. (Reader, L)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/5/2021, ORDERING that the qui tam Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint upon the Defendants. The qui tam Plaintiff shall se rve this Order and the accompanying Notice of Electionto Decline Intervention upon the Defendants after service of the Complaint. The qui tam Plaintiff shall serve this Order and the accompanying Notice of Election to Decline Intervention upon the Defendants after service of the Complaint. All orders of this Court shall be sent to California and Texas. (see order for further details) (Kastilahn, A)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/20/2021 ORDERING 1 Complaint, 21 Notice of Decline and this order are UNSEALED. All previously filed content shall remain SEALED. The Sealed is LIFTED as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve the complaint on the defendants. (Huang, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood et al v. Amgen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?