(PC) Tomasini v. Duncan
Plaintiff: Paul C. Tomasini
Defendant: Jessica Duncan
Case Number: 2:2018cv03020
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-03020-MCE-CKD (PC). (Huang, H)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Paul C. Tomasini. (Huang, H)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Paul C. Tomasini. (Huang, H)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Paul C. Tomasini (Becknal, R)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Paul C. Tomasini, CDC AR-2521 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Notice served on Paul C. Tomasini. (Henshaw, R)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *11/20/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Coll, A)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul C. Tomasini. (Coll, A)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jessica Duncan by Paul C. Tomasini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Paul C. Tomasini. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Tomasini v. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Tomasini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?