Hopson v. The Chicken Barn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Defendant: McHenry-Modesto, The Chicken Barn, Inc., See's Candy Shops, Incorporated, The Chicken Barn, Inc. Doing business as Chicken Barn and See's Candy Shops, Incorporated Doing business as See's Candies
Case Number: 2:2018cv03034
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by McHenry-Modesto. Attorney Elliott, Christopher R. added.(Elliott, Christopher)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by See's Candy Shops, Incorporated. Attorney Strella, Joseph W. added.(Strella, Joseph)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *McHenry-Modesto, See's Candy Shops, Incorporated, The Chicken Barn, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Joseph Malakauskas* *Malakauskas Law Firm* *7345 South Durango Drive, Suite B-107-240* *Las Vegas, NV 89113*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cynthia Hopson. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7982199) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malakauskas, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. The Chicken Barn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry-Modesto
Represented By: Christopher R. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chicken Barn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph W. Strella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chicken Barn, Inc. Doing business as Chicken Barn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Incorporated Doing business as See's Candies
Represented By: Joseph W. Strella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?