Sream, Inc. et al v. All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.
Defendant: All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03057
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Diana Marie Rutowski on behalf of All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc.. Attorney Rutowski, Diana Marie added. (Rutowski, Diana)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to January 28, 2019, by All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc. (Shaffer, Nathan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nathan Daniel Shaffer on behalf of All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc.. Attorney Shaffer, Nathan Daniel added. (Shaffer, Nathan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc. served on 11/30/18. (Vakil, Imran) Modified on 12/12/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 3675839 * * 9/1/2009 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #2:* 2307176 * * 1/11/2000 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #3:* 2235638 * * 3/30/1999 * * Martin Birzle * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Imran F. Vakil* *Nexio PC* *245 Fischer Avenue, Suite C3* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc. by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. Attorney Vakil, Imran F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7985423) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Stop Smoke Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Marie Rutowski
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?