Sream, Inc. et al v. Gurbachan Kaur Samra et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.
Defendant: Gurbachan Kaur Samra
Case Number: 2:2018cv03058
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/2019: Plaintiff's #9 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 2/20/2019 Motion for Default Judgment hearing is granted. Counsel is instructed to use the following to connect to the call: 877-848-7030 (phone), 7431521 (access code).(Streeter, J)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. #8 ) pending before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/11/2019 is VACATED. The status conference will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the pending motion. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 2/20/2019 Motion hearing by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration Investigator, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service)(Vakil, Imran) Modified on 1/18/2019 (Washington, S).
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Gurbachan Kaur Samra* (Kaminski, H)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gurbachan Kaur Samra by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. (Vakil, Imran)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gurbachan Kaur Samra served on 12/6/2018. (Vakil, Imran) Modified on 12/18/2018 (Washington, S).
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 2,235,638 * * 3/30/1999 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #2:* 2,307,176 * * 1/11/2000 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #3:* 3,675,839 * * 9/1/2009 * * Martin Birzle * ; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 4/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gurbachan Kaur Samra* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Imran F. Vakil* *Nexio PC* *245 Fischer Avenue Suite C3* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gurbachan Kaur Samra by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. Attorney Vakil, Imran F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7985449) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Gurbachan Kaur Samra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurbachan Kaur Samra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?