Intel Corporation v. Rivers

Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Defendant: Doyle Rivers
Petitioner: Micron Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03061
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
0 Judge: Allison Claire
1 Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY by Intel Corporation re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Luedtke, Carolyn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 22 OPPOSITION by Doyle Rivers to #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Sakaguchi, #2 Declaration of Doyle Rivers)(Sakaguchi, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/19 DENYING #9 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery and DENYING #14 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice as moot. (Benson, A.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the January 24, 2019 hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 10) and the February 21, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 18) are VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Doyle Rivers in re #18 Motion to Dismiss,. (Sakaguchi, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Doyle Rivers. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Doyle Rivers, #2 Proposed Order)(Sakaguchi, Daniel) Modified on 1/8/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/30/18 GRANTING defendant until 12/27/18 to file their opposition to #9 Ex Parte Application. (Coll, A)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/30/18 GRANTING defendant until 1/4/19 to respond to #1 Complaint. (Coll, A)
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY by Intel Corporation in support #9 Ex Parte Application to Conduct Expedited Discovery. (Beecher, Jeremy)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Non-Party Micron Technology, Inc. to #9 Ex Parte Application to Conduct Expedited Discovery and CROSS-MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER. Attorney Graves, Charles Tait added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J.R. Tietsort, #2 Proposed Order)(Graves, Charles) Modified on 12/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 CORRECTED #12 (SIGNED) DECLARATION of Doyle Rivers. (Sakaguchi, Daniel) Modified on 12/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Doyle Rivers to #9 Ex Parte Application to Conduct Expedited Discovery and CROSS-MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Rivers, #2 Declaration of D. Sakaguchi, #3 Proposed Order)(Sakaguchi, Daniel) Modified on 12/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Time to File Opposition to #9 Ex Parte Application by Doyle Rivers. (Sakaguchi, Daniel) Modified on 12/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Intel Corp. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Carolyn Luedtke, #3 Declaration of Kacey Kranich, #4 Declaration of Kiran Pangal, #5 Declaration of Michael Hanada, #6 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for LEAVE to CONDUCT EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Doyle Rivers. Attorney Sakaguchi, Daniel added. (Sakaguchi, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Doyle Rivers served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Beecher, Jeremy) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Reader, L).
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory Paul Stone on behalf of Intel Corporation. Attorney Stone, Gregory Paul added. (Stone, Gregory)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jeremy Keller Beecher on behalf of Intel Corporation. Attorney Beecher, Jeremy Keller added. (Beecher, Jeremy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Doyle Rivers* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Carolyn H. Luedtke* *Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP* *560 Mission St., 27th Floor* *San Francisco, California 94105*. (Reader, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Intel Corporation. (Luedtke, Carolyn)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doyle Rivers by Intel Corporation. Attorney Luedtke, Carolyn added. (Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luedtke, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intel Corporation v. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Carolyn Luedtke
Represented By: Gregory Paul Stone
Represented By: Jeremy Keller Beecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Rivers
Represented By: Daniel Sakaguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Tait Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?