Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.12.237.246

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.12.237.246
Case Number: 2:2018cv03088
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/23/2019 GRANTING plaintiff's ex parte application for extension of time (ECF No. #7 ). Accordingly, the Plaintiff shall have until 3/1/2019 to file their status statement. (Streeter, J)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for to Extend The Time to File Status Statement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/7/18 GRANTING #3 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Kaminski, H)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/5/18 REASSIGNING This CASE to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and U.S. Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The New Case Number is:2:18-cv-03088-MCE-CKD. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/5/18 REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. The New Case Number: is 2:18-cv-03088-MCE-GGH. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* Copyright Report * * * * * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 Order re Filing Requirements, #4 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.12.237.246 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7993766) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 Copyright Report)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.12.237.246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.12.237.246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?