(PS) Jones v. SEIU et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Jones
Defendant: SEIU and United Health Care Workers-West
Case Number: 2:2018cv03092
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West. (Harland, Bruce)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Harland, Bruce)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Bobby Jones to #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Becknal, R)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Harland, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Harland, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harland, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West in SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Harland, Bruce)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West. Attorney Harland, Bruce A. added. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Harland, Bruce)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: served on 12/6/2018, Maria at the front desk. (Reader, L)
November 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #2 Summons served on Bobby Jones. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bobby Jones* *556 Swan Way* *Vallejo, CA 94589*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE200094306 $400.00 by Bobby Jones on 11/30/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SEIU, United Health Care Workers-West by Bobby Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Jones v. SEIU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU
Represented By: Bruce A. Harland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Workers-West
Represented By: Bruce A. Harland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?