Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.87.200.152

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.87.200.152
Case Number: 2:2018cv03096
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/22/2019: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal at ECF No. #7 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice in its entirety. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED; CASE CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Streeter, J)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/7/18 GRANTING #3 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Kaminski, H)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/5/18 REASSIGNING This CASE to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and U.S. Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The New Case Number is:2:18-cv-03096-MCE-CKD.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/5/18 REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. The New Case Number: is 2:18-cv-03096-MCE GGH. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* See Attached * * * * * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP, #4 Copyright Report) (Reader, L)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement, Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.87.200.152 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7993784) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 Copyright Report)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.87.200.152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.87.200.152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?