(PC) Warren v. Arnold, et al.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Raymond Warren
Defendant: Justin, C. Bayoneta, Mitchel, T. Garth, Warden Solano State Prison, Maya Norberg and Eric Arnold
Case Number: 2:2018cv03109
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-3109-TLN-DMC. (Washington, S)
January 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 26 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Washington, S)
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Washington, S)
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01447.
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/18. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/30/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
November 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #21 Amended Complaint served on Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Hellings, J)
November 16, 2018 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Arnold, Justin, Mitchel, T. Garth, C. Bayoneta. Filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Mailed blank complaint form to plaintiff at SQSP. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/18. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/23/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Amended Complaint due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/18. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/23/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Due Process Equal Protection by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 16 Letter from Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018) Modified on 6/21/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/21/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/21/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 13 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Reassignment. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Plaintiff shall file a certificate of funds signed by a prison official within twenty-eight (28) days from the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018) Modified on 5/22/2018 (sp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Warden Solano State Prison. Filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Raymond Warren (docket updated) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SUA SPONTE GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/13/2018. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maya Norberg, Warden Solano State Prison. Filed by Kenneth Raymond Warren. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Warren v. Arnold, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bayoneta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Garth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Solano State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maya Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Raymond Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?