(HC) Bowens v. Hill
Petitioner: Dante Bowens
Respondent: Rick Hill
Case Number: 2:2018cv03213
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Dante Bowens. (Henshaw, R)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #9 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-3213 KJM DMC (HC). (Henshaw, R)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rick Hill. Attorney Chatman, Catherine added. (Chatman, Catherine)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/11/2019. Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2019. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
January 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Dante Bowens. (Henshaw, R)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/11/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days of the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition, and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami M. Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Dante Bowens. (Coll, A)
December 18, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Notice served on Dante Bowens. (Henshaw, R)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Dante Bowens, CDC AM-1831 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
December 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dante Bowens. (Coll, A)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Coll, A)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dante Bowens. (Coll, A)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Rick Hill by Dante Bowens.(Coll, A) Modified on 12/18/2018 (Coll, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Bowens v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Hill
Represented By: Catherine Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dante Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?