April 18, 2023 |
Filing
435
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff. (ECF Nos. 428 , 429 , 430 , 431 , 433 , 434 ) (Yin, K) Modified on 4/18/2023 (Yin, K).
|
April 11, 2023 |
Filing
432
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff (ECF Nos. 425 , 426 , 427 )(Yin, K)
|
April 4, 2023 |
Filing
424
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/04/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 415 , 416 , 418 , 419 , 420 , 421 , 422 & 423 complaints to plaintiff. (Spichka, K.)
|
March 21, 2023 |
Filing
417
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/21/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 413 and 414 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
March 7, 2023 |
Filing
412
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/07/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk is directed to return the 409 , 410 , and 411 complaints to plaintiff. (Spichka, K.)
|
February 23, 2023 |
Filing
408
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/23/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk is directed to return the 405 , 406 , and 407 complaints to plaintiff. (Spichka, K.)
|
January 31, 2023 |
Filing
404
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/31/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff (ECF Nos. 398 , 399 , 400 , 401 , 403 ). (Yin, K)
|
January 25, 2023 |
Filing
402
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/25/2023 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff (ECF Nos. 394 , 395 , 396 ).(Yin, K)
|
January 18, 2023 |
Filing
397
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 388 , 389 , 390 , 391 , 392 and 393 complaints to plaintiff.(Huang, H)
|
January 3, 2023 |
Filing
387
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/2023 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 379 , 380 , 381 , 382 , 383 , 385 , and 386 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
December 23, 2022 |
Filing
384
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 369 , 371 , 372 , 373 , 374 , 375 , 376 , 377 and 378 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
December 8, 2022 |
Filing
370
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff (ECF Nos. 361 , 362 , 363 , 364 , 365 , 366 , 367 , 368 ). (Yin, K)
|
November 29, 2022 |
Filing
360
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/28/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 350 , 351 , 352 , 353 , 354 , 355 , 356 , 357 , 358 and 359 complaints to plaintiff.(Huang, H)
|
November 2, 2022 |
Filing
349
ORDER signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/2/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 344 , 346 , 347 , & 348 complaints to plaintiff. (Donati, J)
|
October 26, 2022 |
Filing
345
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/26/22 ORDERING may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
October 11, 2022 |
Filing
338
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/11/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 334 , 335 , 336 , and 337 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
September 21, 2022 |
Filing
333
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/21/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 329 , 330 , 331 , and 332 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
September 12, 2022 |
Filing
328
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/12/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 317 , 318 , 319 , 320 , 321 , 322 , 323 , 324 , 326 , and 327 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
September 6, 2022 |
Filing
325
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/06/22 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
August 19, 2022 |
Filing
308
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/19/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return 304 , 305 , 306 and 307 complaints to plaintiff.(Huang, H)
|
August 10, 2022 |
Filing
303
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff (ECF Nos. 297 , 298 , 299 , 300 , 301 , 302 ). (Yin, K)
|
August 2, 2022 |
Filing
296
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/02/22 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
June 22, 2022 |
Filing
290
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/22/22 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
June 13, 2022 |
Filing
289
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return 282 , 283 , and 284 complaints to plaintiff. (Huang, H)
|
May 17, 2022 |
Filing
281
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff. (ECF Nos. 273 , 274 , 275 , 276 , 277 , 278 , and 279 . (Yin, K)
|
March 3, 2022 |
Filing
272
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/03/22 ORDERING may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
February 23, 2022 |
Filing
265
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/23/22 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
February 15, 2022 |
Filing
263
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/15/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint, ECF Nos. 242, 243, 244, 246, 247, 249, 250, and 252, to plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
February 8, 2022 |
Filing
251
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/7/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint, ECF Nos. 238 , 239 , and 240 , to plaintiff.(Henshaw, R)
|
February 1, 2022 |
Filing
248
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/1/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the 235 , 236 complaint to plaintiff. (Yin, K) (Yin, K)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing
245
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/28/22 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
January 19, 2022 |
Filing
241
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/2022 ORDERING Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaints, 229 and 232 , to plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
January 10, 2022 |
Filing
237
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint, ECF Nos. 227 and 228 , to plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
January 4, 2022 |
Filing
231
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/3/2022 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint, ECF Nos. 223 , 224 , 225 , and 226 , to plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
December 29, 2021 |
Filing
230
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the 222 complaint. (Yin, K)
|
December 2, 2021 |
Filing
221
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/2/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the complaint (ECF Nos. 213, 214, 215, 216, 217, 218, 219, 220) to plaintiff. (Yin, K)
|
September 24, 2021 |
Filing
212
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/24/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return documents 203 - 211 to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
June 25, 2021 |
Filing
202
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/25/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
June 17, 2021 |
Filing
201
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/17/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaints to plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 9, 2021 |
Filing
200
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/09/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
June 2, 2021 |
Filing
199
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/2/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint, ECF Nos. 154-163, to Plaintiff. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 27, 2021 |
Filing
198
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in this matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the complaint (ECF Nos. 144-153) to plaintiff. (Yin, K)
|
May 19, 2021 |
Filing
197
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/18/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
May 12, 2021 |
Filing
196
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
|
May 5, 2021 |
Filing
195
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/05/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
April 29, 2021 |
Filing
192
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/29/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the complaint, ECF Nos. 101 , 103 - 111 to plaintiff. (Yin, K)
|
April 23, 2021 |
Filing
190
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/23/2021 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The Clerk shall return the complaint to plaintiff. (Yin, K)
|
April 14, 2021 |
Filing
188
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/13/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The clerk of the court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
April 9, 2021 |
Filing
185
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/08/21 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaint in the above-referenced matter because it attempts to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff.(Plummer, M)
|
March 5, 2020 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/04/20 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaints/petitions in the above referenced matters because they attempt to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County Conviction. The clerk of the Court is directed to return the pleadings to plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
|
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/13/20 ORDERING plaintiff may not file the complaints/petitions in the above reference matters because they attempt to obtain relief related to plaintiff's Alameda County conviction. The clerk of the court is directed to return the pleadings to plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
|
January 9, 2020 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/09/20 ORDERING may not file the complaints/petitions in the above-referenced matters because they attempt to obtain relief related to plaintiffs Alameda County conviction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the pleadings ECF 40 - 44 to plaintiff. (Plummer, M)
|
December 2, 2019 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/2019 DENYING Request to file 4 through 38 Complaints filed by Steven Wayne Bonilla. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RETURN the complaints. (Henshaw, R)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/2018 DENYING Request to file 1 & 2 Complaint filed by Steven Wayne Bonilla. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RETURN the complaints. (Donati, J)
|