Robinson v. Sacramento Hotel Partners et al

Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Defendant: Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners, ABC Corporation and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/21/19 ORDERING that Attorney Harry M. Daniels, PHV added for Plaintiff Jason Robinson. (Kaminski, H)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/21/19 ORDERING that Attorney Graylin Ward, PHV added for Plaintiff Jason Robinson. (Kaminski, H)
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Jason Robinson for attorney Harry M. Daniels to appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8122578) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burris, John) Modified on 2/21/2019 (Benson, A.).
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Jason Robinson for attorney Graylin Ward to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8122601) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burris, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 [DISREGARD - SEE #29 ] PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Jason Robinson for attorney Harry M. Daniels to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Burris, John L. added. [DISREGARD - SEE 29 ] (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8122578) (Burris, John) Modified on 2/21/2019 (Benson, A.).
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS and CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Embassy Suite Management, LLC and Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Snodgrass Willis, Jennifer) Modified on 2/8/2019 (Coll, A).
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners.(Snodgrass Willis, Jennifer)
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer Snodgrass Willis on behalf of Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. Attorney Snodgrass Willis, Jennifer added. (Snodgrass Willis, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorneys Graylin C. Ward, Aynsley Meredith Harrow and Brynda Rodriguez Insley to submit Pro Hac Vice applications. (Robles, S)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03628.
January 10, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Out of Time Reply [Doc. #10 ]; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #6 ; DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint [Doc. #13 ]; and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California in the interests of justice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/10/2019. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Submission of #13 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, MOTION to Substitute Party, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Submission of #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Harrow, Aynsley) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Harrow, Aynsley) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Harrow, Aynsley) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #14 Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery. All pretrial deadlines and discovery in the above-captioned civil action shall be stayed until this Court enters an Order on Defendants' Special Appearance Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/21/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Proof of Service , as to Defendant Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Ward, Graylin) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery with Brief In Support by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrow, Aynsley) Modified on 9/21/2018 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #12 Amended Complaint: Redocketed at #13 as a Motion. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint and MOTION to Add and Substitute Party by Jason Robinson. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: Redocketed at #13 as a Motion--- First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Robinson filed by Jason Robinson.(Ward, Graylin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 9/19/2018 to terminate and redocket as a Motion. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay filed by Jason Robinson. (Ward, Graylin) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit docket relationship and text. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Jason Robinson. (Ward, Graylin) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Submission of #6 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVITS of Service as to Defendants Sacramento Hotel Partners, Embassy Suite Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Ward, Graylin) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 A.O. Form 121 Copyright docketed in error. (btql) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR AO Form 121 mailed to Registrar. (btql) Modified on 8/22/2018 (btql). [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC and Sacramento Hotel Partners. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brynda Rodriguez Insley on behalf of Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners (Insley, Brynda) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss)(Harrow, Aynsley) . Added MOTION to Stay on 8/22/2018 (btql). [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners. (Harrow, Aynsley) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aynsley Meredith Harrow on behalf of Embassy Suite By Hilton, Embassy Suite Management, LLC, Sacramento Hotel Partners (Harrow, Aynsley) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sacramento Hotel Partners. (tcc) [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jason Robinson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8042688) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Sacramento Hotel Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassy Suite By Hilton
Represented By: Brynda Rodriguez Insley, NCAED
Represented By: Aynsley Meredith Harrow, NCAED
Represented By: Jennifer Snodgrass Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassy Suite Management, LLC
Represented By: Brynda Rodriguez Insley, NCAED
Represented By: Aynsley Meredith Harrow, NCAED
Represented By: Jennifer Snodgrass Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Hotel Partners
Represented By: Brynda Rodriguez Insley, NCAED
Represented By: Aynsley Meredith Harrow, NCAED
Represented By: Jennifer Snodgrass Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Robinson
Represented By: Graylin C. Ward, NCAED
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Harry M. Daniels, PHV
Represented By: Graylin Ward, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?