(PC) Evans v. Carlock, et al.

Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Evans
Defendant: John F. Schuck, Judge Jeffery Tauber, Stephen Brown, Wendy Getty, Ilana Jacobs, Bryan Hamilton, Public Defender Sarah Johnson and Lisa Carlock
Case Number: 2:2019cv00110
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: California Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Richard Anthony Evans. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 12 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-06401.
January 16, 2019 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/17. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 12/19/17 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
December 14, 2017 9 Letter dated 12/10/17 from Richard Evans. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
December 14, 2017 8 COMPLAINT under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against Lisa Carlock, Stephen Brown, Bryan Hamilton, Ilana Jacobs, Sarah Johnson, Jeffery Tauber, Wendy Getty, John F. Schuck (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Richard Anthony Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/17. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
December 6, 2017 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M Illman. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/6/17. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
November 2, 2017 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
November 2, 2017 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/11/2017. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
November 2, 2017 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 12/11/2017. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]
November 2, 2017 1 Received Document by Richard Anthony Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Evans v. Carlock, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Schuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Jeffery Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilana Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Defender Sarah Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Carlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Anthony Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?