(HC) Melendez-Castillo v. Nielsen et al

Petitioner: Pablo Melendez-Castillo
Respondent: Timothy Aitken, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matt Whitaker, Wendell Anderson and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00122
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matt Whitaker. (Hemesath, Audrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE and MOTION to DISMISS by Timothy Aitken, Wendell Anderson, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matt Whitaker. Attorney Hemesath, Audrey Benison added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hemesath, Audrey) Modified on 2/26/2019 (Plummer, M).
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Kirstjen Nielsen re #6 Designation of Counsel,. (Hemesath, Audrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath for Kirstjen Nielsen,Audrey Benison Hemesath for Ronald D. Vitiello,Audrey Benison Hemesath for Matt Whitaker, attorney US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit terminated (Hemesath, Audrey)
January 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Pablo Melendez-Castillo. (Henshaw, R)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/24/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and ORDERING Respondent to file an answer or motion in response to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
January 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Pablo Melendez-Castillo. (York, M)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 2/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (York, M)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Pablo Melendez-Castillo. (York, M)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Pablo Melendez-Castillo. (York, M)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Timothy Aitken, Wendell Anderson, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matt Whitaker by Pablo Melendez-Castillo.(York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Melendez-Castillo v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Aitken
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Whitaker
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendell Anderson
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pablo Melendez-Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?