(SS) (PS) Walters v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Chris Walters
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00238
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order served on Chris Walters. (Benson, A.)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/11/19 DENYING #8 Motion to defer and offset to 3rd party UN Security Council because the court has no jurisdiction to grant such relief; DENYING #12 Motion to Amend the Complaint as moot and DENYING #12 Motion for Temporary Injunction as the court lacks jurisdiction to grant injunctive relief against a non-party to this action under the circumstances presented here. Plaintiff is also advised that most social security actions are resolved on the record and written briefing without the need for hearings, and as such, plaintiff would not have to travel extensively, if at all, to litigate this case. (Benson, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Chris Walters.(Benson, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Social Security Complaint and MOTION for TEMPORARY INJUNCTION by Chris Walters. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Temporary Injunction)(Benson, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Chris Walters. (Benson, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Chris Walters pursuant to order of the court. (Benson, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of CD-Rom from Plaintiff, (Routed to File Room). (Washington, S)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to DEFER and offset 3rd Party UN Security Council by Chris Walters. (Becknal, R)
February 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, #6 Summons, #7 Social Security New Case Documents served on Chris Walters with USM-285 form. (Zignago, K.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Chris Walters* *622 N Sacramento Street* *Lodi CA 95240*. (Zignago, K.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/2019 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Service is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk is directed to serve scheduling order. Within 14 days plaintiff shall submit to the USM an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, five copies of the scheduling order, and a completed USM-285 form, and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's #4 motion for summary judgment is DENIED without prejudice as premature. (Zignago, K.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Chris Walters. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING CD (Text Only) by Chris Walters: Titled Evidence and Testimony Submitted to Congress re #1 Social Security Complaint. (York, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Chris Walters. (York, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Chris Walters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) (PS) Walters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?