(PC) Wilson v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Wilson
Defendant: Earl Helfrich, G. Davis, Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center, Scott R. Jones, Sacramento County Main Jail, Sacramento County and Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00249
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion for Extension served on Michael James Wilson. (Yin, K)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/15/2019 GRANTING plaintiff's #8 motion for an extension of time and plaintiff has 30 days to submit his application to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file new IFP by Michael James Wilson. (Coll, A) Modified on 3/15/2019 (Plummer, M).
March 6, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Michael James Wilson to updated address. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-Not in Custody-RTS: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, sent to Michael James Wilson: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center, 12500 Bruceville Road, Elk Grove, CA 95757. (York, M)
February 27, 2019 ADDRESS UPDATED to 23500 Kasson Rd; Tracy CA 95376 pursuant to Notice of Change of Address filed in 2:18-cv-02427-KJM-KJN. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 27, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and prisoner IFP application served on Michael James Wilson on updated address. (Plummer, M)
February 26, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not In Custody: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and ifp application, sent to Michael James Wilson. (Change of Address filed 2/25/2019) (Washington, S)
February 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Michael James Wilson. (Washington, S)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0249-WBS-AC (PC). (Washington, S)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michael James Wilson. (Washington, S)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 23500 Kasson Rd; Tracy CA 95376 by Michael James Wilson. (Washington, S)
February 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp application served on Michael James Wilson. (Yin, K)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/14/2019 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's #2 application to proceed IFP; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall, within 30 days, submit a current and fully completed ifp together with a current certified copy of his jail trust account statement. (Yin, K)
February 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael James Wilson. (Coll, A)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Coll, A)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael James Wilson. (Coll, A)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael James Wilson.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilson v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Helfrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?