Esler v. Greystripe LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Esler
Defendant: Greystripe LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00320
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Answer Complaint by Greystripe LLC. Attorney Adams, Keith Gregory added. (Adams, Keith) Modified on 4/5/2019 (Reader, L).
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Greystripe LLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* VA0002024298 / 2016-10-18 * * Entry Not Found * * Christopher Lee Esler * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 Order re Filing Requirements, #4 VDRP) (Reader, L)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Greystripe LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonah A. Grossbardt* *Sriplaw, PA* *1801 Century Park East, Suite 1100* *Los Angeles, California 90067*. (Reader, L)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Esler. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher Lee Esler (Grossbardt, Jonah) Modif
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greystripe LLC by Christopher Lee Esler. Attorney Grossbardt, Jonah Adam added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8124720) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement)(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esler v. Greystripe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystripe LLC
Represented By: Keith Gregory Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Esler
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?