Pollard v. Soloniuk Clinic et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv00325
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/1/24, ORDERING that Defendants should answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in Intervention on or before 3/4/24. (Kastilahn, A)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/23/24 ORDERING the partial dismissal without prejudice of Counts III through VIII of Plaintiff-Relator's False Claims Act Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/09/24 ORDERING that, per 43 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, the parties shall serve all pleadings, motions, memoranda, proposed orders, and notices filed in this action upon t he State in accordance with the California False Claims Act; all orders of this Court shall be sent to the State by Relator's counsel; The State may order any deposition transcripts; and The State, for good cause, may at any time intervene i n this action. In the event Relator or Defendants propose this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued as to the State, this Court directs and orders Relator to solicit and submit to the Court the written consent of the State before filing such proposal so that the Court may consider said consent before ruling or granting its approval. (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/29/2023 GRANTING 37 Ex Parte Application. The State of California shall have until 2/12/2024 to make its intervention decision and to file any related complaint in intervention. (Clemente Licea, O)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/2023 UNSEALING the case, 1 Complaint and 31 Notice of Intervention and DIRECTING the United States to serve process on the Defendants. All other previously filed documents shall remain sealed. All future filed documents shall be publicly filed. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Soloniuk Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?