Sweet v. California Association of Psychiatric Technicians et al

Plaintiff: Alfred Sweet
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, California Association of Psychiatric Technicians and Stephanie Clendenin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00349
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to DISMISS by California Association of Psychiatric Technicians. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Bedrosian, Sean)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER by Xavier Becerra, Stephanie Clendenin.(Onyeagbako, Maureen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Complaint by California Association of Psychiatric Technicians. Attorney Bedrosian, Sean added. (Bedrosian, Sean)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Stephanie Clendenin. Attorney Onyeagbako, Maureen C. added. (Onyeagbako, Maureen)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/13/2019 ADDING attorney Reilly Stephens, PHV for Alfred Sweet. (Washington, S)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Association of Psychiatric Technicians served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Bucher, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stephanie Clendenin served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Bucher, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Bucher, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stephanie Clendenin served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Bucher, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Alfred Sweet for attorney Reilly Stephens to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8157130) (Bucher, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/12/2019. Added attorney Brian K. Kelsey, PHV for Alfred Sweet. (Huang, H)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Alfred Sweet for attorney Brian K. Kelsey to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8154204) (Bucher, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Alfred Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Bucher, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, California Association of Psychiatric Technicians, Stephanie Clendenin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark William Bucher* *Law Office of Mark W Bucher* *18002 Irvine Blvd., Suite# 108* *Tustin, CA 92780*. (Kaminski, H)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Alfred Sweet (Bucher, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Alfred Sweet. Attorney Bucher, Mark William added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8131925) (Bucher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet v. California Association of Psychiatric Technicians et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Association of Psychiatric Technicians
Represented By: Sean Bedrosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clendenin
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Sweet
Represented By: Mark William Bucher
Represented By: Brian K. Kelsey, PHV
Represented By: Reilly Stephens, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?