Corral v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: Frank Corral
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00376
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendant's Deadline to Respond by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura) Modified on 5/1/2019 (Kaminski, H).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/25/19. EXTENDING time for plaintiff to file first amended complaint until 04/26/19; defendant shall have until 05/28/19 to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. (Benson, A.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time Regarding Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendant's Deadline to Respond by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint By 28 Days by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Attorney Stoll, Laura A. added. (Stoll, Laura) Modified on 4/1/2019 (Coll, A).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Frank Corral. (Friedman, Todd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nationstar Mortgage, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St. Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC by Frank Corral. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8139728) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corral v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Laura A. Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Corral
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?