Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00382
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. Attorney Braun, Barrett Benjamen added. (Braun, Barrett)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Uno, Karen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karen Lee Uno* *Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer* *1255 Powell Street* *Emeryville, CA 94608*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Uno, Karen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Uno, Karen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Attorney Uno, Karen Lee added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8140367) (Uno, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Barrett Benjamen Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen Lee Uno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?